Financial history INTERHEALTH WORLDWIDE

Charity number: 1103935
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016
Total gross income £2.03m £2.05m £2.12m £2.95m £2.74m
Total expenditure £2.02m £2.03m £2.13m £2.84m £2.77m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Donations and legacies £71.92k £99.71k £102.02k £148.12k £44.19k
Income - Other trading activities £32.29k £8.14k £0 £0 £40.31k
Income - Charitable activities £1.92m £1.94m £2.02m £2.80m £2.65m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £135 £1.82k £212 £5.95k £5.17k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.00m £2.01m £2.22m £2.81m £2.77m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance £5.20k £4.80k £10.94k £20.85k £28.97k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £12.21k £0 £0