Financial history ETZ CHAIM FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1101688
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2005 31/08/2006 31/08/2008 31/08/2009 31/08/2010
Total gross income £309.94k £268.91k £94.25k £156.39k £158.11k
Total expenditure £301.22k £87.32k £56.06k £131.95k £166.33k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A