Accounts and annual returns THE LAURENCE DAVIS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity Number: 1102009
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2015 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2014 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2013 30 July 2014 180 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2012 25 February 2013 25 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 Not Required