Financial history CHURCHES TOGETHER IN SHIFNAL DISTRICT

Charity number: 1103258
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £338 £30 £179 £1 £1.74k
Total expenditure £205 £60 £21 £2.48k £390
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A