Accounts and annual returns PARENTS AND FRIENDS OF YSGOL BRO INGLI

Charity Number: 1102195
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2007 05 February 2008 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2006 05 February 2008 370 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2005 07 March 2006 35 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 Not Required