Accounts and annual returns PARENTHOOD

Charity Number: 1103616
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 29 July 2010 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2008 28 April 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 25 March 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2007 18 October 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 01 October 2008 On Time