Financial history SPITAL TONGUES BEACON COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1102046
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015
Total gross income £9.27k £7.65k £18.39k £3.38k £4.60k
Total expenditure £9.15k £4.64k £16.61k £3.31k £3.63k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A