Accounts and annual returns THE WILLOUGHBY RESPITE CARE FUND
Charity number: 1102496
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | 15 September 2008 | 228 days late | |
Annual return | 31 October 2005 | 06 April 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2005 | Not Required |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window