Financial history THE ABA BORNSTEIN CHARITY

Charity number: 1103034
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2007 31/03/2008 31/03/2009 31/03/2010 31/03/2011
Total gross income £14.82k £16.32k £11.04k £220 £237
Total expenditure £108.25k £85.60k £62.63k £46.04k £88.09k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A