Accounts and annual returns PASTON RIDINGS PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENTS TEACHERS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1102229
Charity reporting is overdue by 335 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 335 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 335 days
Annual return 31 July 2022 14 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 17 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 23 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 23 March 2021 296 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required