Accounts and annual returns KICK-START LONDON

Charity number: 1102453
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2010 02 August 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 30 July 2010 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2009 19 November 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 19 November 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2008 23 December 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 31 December 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2007 22 January 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 30 January 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2006 09 November 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 10 November 2006 On Time