Financial history FILM IT

Charity Number: 1104532
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2005 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 31/03/2008 31/03/2009
Total gross income £62.85k £150.85k £196.89k £369.11k £161.80k
Total expenditure £45.78k £146.28k £207.56k £305.07k £181.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A