Financial history THE HOLME MISSION FUND

Charity number: 1102968
Charity reporting is up to date (5 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £12.14k £11.25k £11.15k £12.48k £12.48k
Total expenditure £4.50k £0 £11.07k £5.82k £6.18k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A