Accounts and annual returns THE FRIENDS OF WAKEFIELD CITY HIGH SCHOOL

Charity number: 1102579
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2006 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2005 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2005 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2004 26 November 2004 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2004 Not Required