Financial history FRIENDS OF FLEET WOOD LANE SCHOOL

Charity number: 1102523
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £7.64k £4.71k £12.28k £15.56k £12.01k
Total expenditure £6.43k £17.10k £3.56k £21.13k £8.82k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £600 N/A N/A