Accounts and annual returns HIGHGATE FAMILY SUPPORT CENTRE

Charity number: 1102760
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2020 02 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 30 May 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2018 31 May 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2017 22 June 2018 22 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 22 June 2018 22 days late