Financial history DAYSPRING LEARNING CENTRE

Charity number: 1102813
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2006 31/07/2007 31/07/2008 31/07/2009 31/07/2010
Total gross income £50.69k £64.55k £61.00k £13.10k £0
Total expenditure £56.19k £59.05k £61.48k £25.59k £906
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A