Accounts and annual returns YOUNG RISERS ACCREDITED PRE-SCHOOL LIMITED

Charity number: 1102890
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2007 17 December 2008 47 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2006 19 June 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2005 06 November 2006 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2005 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2004 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2004 Not submitted