Accounts and annual returns MPOWER - HELPLINE FOR MALE SURVIVOR

Charity number: 1104195
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 31 October 2006 13 February 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2005 12 December 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2005 Not Required