Financial history THE ANNE HARRIS CHILDREN'S FUND

Charity number: 1103306
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £7.48k £13 £95 £6.69k £6.55k
Total expenditure £6.71k £0 £2.92k £4.30k £4.97k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A