Accounts and annual returns CHILDREN MATTER

Charity Number: 1103377
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2007 11 June 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2007 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2006 11 June 2008 317 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2006 11 September 2007 43 days late
Annual return 31 March 2005 28 March 2006 56 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 23 February 2006 23 days late