Accounts and annual returns SKILLSWISE TRAINING AND DEVELOPMENT LIMITED

Charity number: 1104183
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2006 Not submitted
Annual return 31 October 2005 16 August 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2005 16 August 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 October 2004 22 November 2005 83 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2004 22 November 2005 83 days late