Financial history FRIENDS OF BRIDGEMERE SCHOOL

Charity number: 1103196
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £2.23k £2.28k £5.18k £5.94k £6.33k
Total expenditure £1.12k £965 £1.97k £1.98k £2.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A