Accounts and annual returns EAST BRISTOL ADVICE SERVICES

Charity number: 1103420
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2011 30 December 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 30 December 2011 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2010 20 January 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 05 January 2011 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2009 02 August 2010 183 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 02 February 2010 2 days late
Annual return 31 March 2008 15 January 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 02 December 2008 On Time