Accounts and annual returns CHELMSFORD ESSEX CROSSROADS - CARING FOR CARERS LIMITED

Charity number: 1103515
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2008 22 January 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 31 January 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2007 06 February 2008 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 05 February 2008 5 days late
Annual return 31 March 2006 26 January 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 26 January 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2005 21 February 2006 21 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 31 January 2006 On Time