Financial history LIVERPOOL EPILEPSY ASSOCIATION & FRIENDS

Charity number: 1103265
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2009 31/03/2010 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013
Total gross income £69 £211 £199 £199 £199
Total expenditure £13 £12 £12 £12 £12
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A