Financial history HAIG COLLIERY MINING MUSEUM

Charity number: 1103729
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2009 31/03/2010 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013
Total gross income £449.06k £138.64k £190.56k £286.60k £72.48k
Total expenditure £457.24k £132.34k £179.01k £282.86k £125.01k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A