Financial history BREADSALL C.E. PRIMARY SCHOOL PTFA

Charity number: 1103424
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £1.81k £1.86k £1.16k £3.95k £6.13k
Total expenditure £3.17k £2.11k £1.13k £4.35k £3.98k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A