Accounts and annual returns HERMON CHAPEL PRESERVATION TRUST

Charity number: 1103793
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2007 03 June 2008 124 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 09 November 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2006 26 September 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 26 September 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2005 07 November 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 07 November 2005 On Time