Financial history CWRT-YR-ALA PARENT FRIENDS & TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1103875
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 15/10/2005 15/10/2006 15/10/2007 15/10/2008 15/10/2009
Total gross income £1.70k £925 £115 £4.00k £0
Total expenditure £1.56k £1.65k £150 £4.17k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A