Accounts and annual returns THE BRIAN PATTERSON EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity number: 1104021
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2016 23 November 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2015 09 November 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2015 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2014 15 September 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2014 Not Required