Accounts and annual returns CALVERT GREEN COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1104354
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 26 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 26 July 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2022 31 July 2023 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 31 July 2023 1 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2021 29 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 29 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 21 March 2022 234 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 28 April 2022 272 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2019 08 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 03 September 2020 35 days late Download Open in new window