Accounts and annual returns THE HAMPSHIRE CALEDONIAN PIPE BAND

Charity number: 1105177
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 26 October 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 26 October 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 26 October 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 26 October 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 01 October 2007 25 February 2009 208 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 October 2007 Not Required
Annual return 26 October 2006 26 January 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 26 October 2006 26 January 2007 On Time
Annual return 26 October 2005 31 December 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 26 October 2005 Not Required