Accounts and annual returns DOXA DEO LONDON

Charity Number: 1104211
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 30 April 2018 31 December 2019 306 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 31 December 2019 306 days late
Annual return 31 December 2017 28 September 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 28 September 2018 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2016 30 October 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 30 October 2017 On Time