Trustees PENTON COMMUNITY AND SOCIAL CLUB LIMITED
Charity number: 1104526

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Wrake | Trustee | 09 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Roberto Buono | Trustee | 09 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Avril Stocks | Trustee | 09 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mary Power | Trustee | 21 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Yvonne Gary | Trustee | 21 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dolsie Clarke | Trustee | 02 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sylvia Dally | Trustee | 22 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sally Anne Hutchinson | Trustee | 22 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Chris Liddle | Trustee | 13 August 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.