Accounts and annual returns LOTE TREE TRUST

Charity Number: 1105862
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2015 23 March 2016 52 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2014 25 February 2016 390 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2013 25 February 2016 755 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 Not Required