Accounts and annual returns EXETER DANCE FESTIVAL

Charity number: 1115451
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2024 22 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2024 22 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2023 29 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2022 03 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2021 20 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2020 19 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Not Required