Financial history UTOPIA ARTS LIMITED

Charity Number: 1108031
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £0 £3.80k £8.25k £1.50k £0
Total expenditure £515 £3.96k £4.57k £4.88k £384
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A