Accounts and annual returns LLANGATTOCK SCHOOL PTA

Charity Number: 1105087
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 12 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 14 August 2023 45 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 04 July 2022 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 04 July 2022 369 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 04 July 2022 734 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required