Accounts and annual returns THE LIVERPOOL CARTERS HORSE MONUMENT APPEAL FUND

Charity number: 1106164
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2022 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 Not submitted
Annual return 31 May 2021 07 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2020 18 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2019 16 March 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 Not Required