Accounts and annual returns RINGLAND COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION LIMITED

Charity number: 1104964
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2017 27 February 2018 27 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

29 December 2017 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2016 09 March 2017 37 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 26 September 2016 On Time