Financial history BUDDHIST AID

Charity Number: 1105950
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £2.55k £1.59k £1.37k £560 £1.00k
Total expenditure £103 £400 £826 £100 £571
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A