Accounts and annual returns ARK (SOUTH AFRICA) LIMITED

Charity number: 1108175
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 26 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 26 June 2024 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2022 20 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 20 June 2023 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2021 29 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 29 June 2022 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2020 17 August 2021 48 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 17 August 2021 48 days late
Annual return 31 August 2019 03 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 03 June 2020 On Time