Accounts and annual returns RAY OF GOOD HOPE

Charity number: 1106186
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2013 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2013 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2012 03 April 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2012 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2011 02 November 2012 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2011 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2010 02 November 2012 368 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2010 Not Required