DEAF DIRECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide information and advice on any topic related to deafness, along with providing direct services to promote independence and equality of opportunity for deaf and hard of hearing people living in Herefordshire, Oxfordshire and Worcestershire.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Buckinghamshire
- Herefordshire
- Oxfordshire
- Reading
- West Berkshire
- Wokingham
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 27 March 1962: Standard registration
- 12 February 2009: Funds transferred to 1112272 OXFORD DEAF AND HARD OF HEARING CENTRE
No other names
- Care Quality Commission
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BARRY ROSS | Chair | 21 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Penelope Lenon | Trustee | 21 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM STAVERT | Trustee | 21 June 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.03m | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.15m | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £61.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £126.94k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £652.52k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £252.07k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £74.50k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.15m | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £12.19k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 12 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 12 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 09 February 2023 | 194 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 22 March 2022 | 235 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 30 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 30 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 18 JUNE 2003
Charitable objects
1 . THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO ARE DEAF OR HARD OF HEARING WHO ARE RESIDENT IN THE ARE; OF THE COUNTIES OF HEREFORDSHIRE AND WORCESTERSHIRE ("THE AREA OF PRIMARY BENEFIT") IN ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING WAYS- 1.1 TO IMPROVE THE QUALITY OF LIFE OF PERSONS WHO ARE DEAF OR HARD OF HEARING WHO ARE RESIDENT IN THE PRIMARY AREA OF BENEFIT 1.2 TO PROVIDE SUCH OTHER SERVICES BEING CHARITABLE AS THE DIRECTORS OF THE CHARITY (HERE AND AFTER REFERRED TO AS "THE TRUSTEES") THINK FIT HAVING IN VIEW THE SPIRITUAL, INTELLECTUAL OR BODILY WELFARE OF SUCH PERSONS 2. THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO ARE DEAF OR HARD OF HEARING WHO ARE RESIDENT IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND OVERSEAS ("THE AREA OF SECONDARY BENEFIT'S) IN ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING WAYS: 2.1 TO IMPROVE THE QUALITY OF LIFE OF PERSONS WHO ARE DEAF OR HARD OF HEARING WHO ARE RESIDENT IN THE SECONDARY AREA OF BENEFIT 2.2 TO PROVIDE SUCH OTHER SERVICES BEING CHARITABLE AS THE DIRECTORS OF THE CHARITY (HERE AND AFTER REFERRED TO AS "THE TRUSTEES") THINK FIT HAVING IN VIEW THE SPIRITUAL, INTELLECTUAL OR BODILY WELFARE OF SUCH PERSONS 3. ANY OTHER GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSE IN THE. AREA OF PRIMARY BENEFIT AND/OR THE AREA OF SECONDARY BENEFIT
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS
Linked charities
- 27 March 1962 : Standard registration
- 12 February 2009 : Asset transfer out
Contact information
- Address:
-
Deaf Direct Ltd
Vesta Tilley House
Lowesmoor
WORCESTER
WR1 2RS
- Phone:
- 01905746301
- Email:
- info@deafdirect.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window