Financial history BAGS FOR CHARITY

Charity number: 1105181
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018
Total gross income £21.19k £20.81k £20.69k £21.31k £20.93k
Total expenditure £5.72k £11.00k £22.00k £22.00k £22.00k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A £0 £0 £0 £0