Financial history THE TROY WHARF TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 1108462
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £6.02k £5.01k £6.00k £8.83k £6.16k
Total expenditure £5.68k £4.31k £3.91k £4.10k £4.51k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A