Financial history HOME-START COUNTY BOROUGH OF WREXHAM

Charity number: 1105325
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £196.49k £242.78k £247.26k £249.18k £297.12k
Total expenditure £207.63k £211.64k £226.84k £253.30k £299.45k
Income from government contracts N/A £66.55k N/A £110.38k N/A
Income from government grants £66.55k N/A N/A N/A £183.99k