Financial history BUILDING BRIGHTER FUTURES

Charity number: 1105425
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £7.91k £7.79k £8.18k £7.30k £7.51k
Total expenditure £5.39k £5.58k £9.08k £7.92k £6.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A