Accounts and annual returns ARTS & MEDIA TRAINING LTD

Charity number: 1105344
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2009 26 October 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 26 October 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2008 23 December 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 23 December 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2007 19 February 2008 19 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 28 December 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2006 28 November 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 28 November 2006 On Time